Table of Contents

Toggle**NCERT Solutions for class 6 maths chapter 2 exercise 2.3**is all about practicing of addition, subtraction, multiplication and dividing the numbers. there may be different ways to solve them with less amount of time. Class 6 maths chapter 2 exercise 2.3 solutions are provided here in simple ways. Class 6

^{th}maths 2.3 has total 5 questions to solve. so, students can check the solutions of whole number exercise 2.3 given below.

## NCERT Solutions for Class 6 Maths, chapter 2, Whole Numbers, Exercise 2.3

**Q.1.Which of the following will not represent zero:**

$\begin{align}

& (a)\,\,1+0 \\

& (b)\,\,0\times 0 \\

& (c)\,\,\frac{0}{2} \\

& (d)\,\,\frac{10-10}{2} \\

\end{align}$

**Ans: ****(a) 1 + 0 = 1**

Hence, it will not represent zero

(b) 0 × 0 = 0

Hence, it will represent zero

(c) 0 / 2 = 0

Hence, it will represent zero

(d) (10 – 10) /2= 0/2 = 0

Hence, it represents zero

**Q.2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will be zero? Justify through examples.**

**Ans: **Yes, if we multiply any number with zero the resultant product will always be zero.

Example: 0 × 5 = 0 and 599 × 0 = 0

if both numbers are zero, then the result also be zero.

Example: 0 × 0 = 0

Yes, if the product of two whole numbers is zero, then both of them will be zero

**Q.3. If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be 1? Justify through examples.**

**Ans: **If the product of two whole numbers is 1, both the numbers should be equal to 1

Example: 1 × 1 = 1 But 1 × 9 = 9

Hence, it’s clear that If both numbers are 1, then the product is 1.

**Q.4. Find using distributive property:**

**(a) 728 × 101 **

**(b) 5437 × 1001 **

**(c) 824 × 25 **

**(d) 4275 × 125 **

**(e) 504 × 35**

**Ans:**

**(a) 728 × 101**

**= **728 × (100 + 1)

= (728 × 100) + (728 × 1)

= 72800 + 728

= 73528

**(b) 5437 × 1001**

= 5437 × (1000 + 1)

= (5437 × 1000) + (5437 × 1)

= 5437000 + 5437

= 5442437

**(c) 824 × 25**

= (800 + 24) × 25

= (800 + 25 – 1) × 25

= (800 × 25) + (25 × 25) – (1 × 25)

= 20000 + 625 – 25

= 20000 + 600

= 20600

**(d) 4275 × 125**

= (4000 + 200 + 100 – 25) × 125

= (4000 × 125) + (200 × 125) + (100 × 125) – (25 × 125)

= 500000 + 25000 + 12500 – 3125

= 534375

**(e) 504 × 35**

= (500 + 4) × 35

= (500 × 35) + (4 × 35)

= 17500 + 140

= 17640

**Q.5. Study the pattern :**

**1 × 8 + 1 = 9 ; **

**12 × 8 + 2 = 98; **

**123 × 8 + 3 = 987;**

**1234 × 8 + 4 = 9876 ;**

**12345 × 8 + 5 = 98765;**

**Write the next two steps. Can you say how the pattern works?**

**Ans:**